Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/13/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/27/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/27/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/27/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/27/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/27/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/27/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/18/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/18/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/18/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/18/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/18/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/18/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/18/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/02/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/07/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/15/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/07/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/23/2008