Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/13/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/13/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/13/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/13/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/21/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/21/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/21/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/21/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/21/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/21/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/21/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/21/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/21/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/21/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/26/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/26/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/26/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/26/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/26/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/28/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/28/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/28/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/28/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/28/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/28/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/28/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/28/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/28/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/28/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/29/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/29/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/16/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/18/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/18/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/26/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/26/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/26/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/26/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/26/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/03/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/03/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/09/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/09/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/09/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/17/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/17/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/24/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/07/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/14/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/14/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/14/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/14/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/14/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/14/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/14/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/28/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/28/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/17/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/23/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/26/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/26/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 08/02/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/27/2007

Show cosponsors who withdrew