Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/22/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/05/2007