Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/27/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/14/2007