Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/09/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/09/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/19/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/19/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/19/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/19/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/19/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/19/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/19/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/21/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/21/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/21/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/21/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/21/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/21/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/21/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/23/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/23/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/23/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/23/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/27/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/16/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/16/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/16/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/18/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/19/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/23/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/23/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/23/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/24/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/30/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/30/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/01/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/03/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/10/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/15/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/14/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/18/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/19/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/18/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/09/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/12/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/27/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/28/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/04/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/12/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/12/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/13/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/09/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 04/09/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/03/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/18/2008