Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/20/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/20/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/20/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/20/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/22/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/22/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/22/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/22/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/23/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/23/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/16/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/16/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/16/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/16/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/16/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/20/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/20/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/20/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/20/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/20/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/02/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/02/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/06/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/06/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/12/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/12/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/14/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/14/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/18/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/26/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/26/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/26/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/26/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/27/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/28/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/11/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/11/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/16/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/19/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/04/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/20/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/24/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/16/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/29/2007