Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/08/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/08/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/15/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/15/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/15/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/15/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/15/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/23/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/23/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/29/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/29/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/29/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/29/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/29/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/20/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/20/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/20/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/20/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/20/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/26/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/26/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/26/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/26/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/26/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/03/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/03/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/16/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/16/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/16/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/05/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/18/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/18/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/18/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/28/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/28/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/23/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/29/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 11/08/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/18/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/17/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/25/2008