Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/15/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/15/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/15/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/15/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/15/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/15/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/19/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/19/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/19/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/21/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/21/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/21/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/21/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/21/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/21/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/21/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/28/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/28/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/28/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/28/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/28/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/28/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/29/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/29/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/29/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/25/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/25/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 06/20/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/20/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/16/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/16/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/16/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/16/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/16/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/16/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/16/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/24/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/24/2007