Refine your search

Date Major Actions
08/09/2007 Became Public Law No: 110-60.
08/09/2007 Signed by President.
08/06/2007 Presented to President.
08/03/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10978-10979)
07/30/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
07/30/2007 Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
03/07/2007 Introduced in House