Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/07/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/07/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/08/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/12/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/12/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/12/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/12/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/12/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/21/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/26/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/26/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/28/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/09/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/09/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/11/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/11/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/11/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/11/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/11/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/18/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/18/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/18/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/18/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/18/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/27/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/11/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/11/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/11/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/11/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/11/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/12/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/12/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/12/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/12/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/18/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/18/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/25/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/25/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/25/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/27/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/30/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/30/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/03/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 08/03/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/04/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/04/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 08/04/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/04/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/07/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/14/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/14/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/14/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/19/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/19/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/02/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/02/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/02/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/17/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/23/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/23/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/23/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/25/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/25/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/31/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/31/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/09/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/09/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/15/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/13/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/13/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/23/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/04/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/13/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/13/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/02/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/02/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/17/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/30/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/21/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/21/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/21/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/03/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 07/15/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/24/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/24/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/24/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/11/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/17/2008