Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/01/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/01/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/06/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/06/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/06/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/06/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/06/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/06/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/13/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/13/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/13/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/26/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/28/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/16/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/16/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/17/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/25/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/01/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/14/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/14/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/11/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/11/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/13/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/18/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/17/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/01/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 12/04/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/04/2007
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/08/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/09/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/15/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 09/15/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/15/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/15/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/16/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/18/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/18/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/18/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/18/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/22/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/23/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/23/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/24/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/24/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/24/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/24/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/24/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/26/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/26/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/26/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/26/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/26/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/26/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/26/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/26/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/26/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/26/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/26/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/19/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/19/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/19/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/19/2008