Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/27/2008