Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/28/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/28/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/28/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/09/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/09/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/23/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/23/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/18/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/20/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/09/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/09/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/09/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/09/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/09/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/14/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/14/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/14/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/14/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/14/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/15/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/15/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/15/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/15/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/17/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/21/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/21/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/23/2007