Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/28/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/28/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/28/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/28/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/08/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/09/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/28/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/16/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/16/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/30/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/02/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/14/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 08/04/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 08/04/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 08/04/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 08/04/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 08/04/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/17/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/17/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/17/2007
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/10/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/13/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/23/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/16/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/11/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/24/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/16/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/18/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/29/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/10/2008