Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/14/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/14/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/14/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/14/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/14/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/14/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/14/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/20/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/20/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/20/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/20/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/27/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/27/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/27/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/27/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/27/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/27/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/27/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/27/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/27/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/27/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/29/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/29/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/29/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/16/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/16/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/16/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/16/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/16/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/16/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/16/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 04/18/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/18/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/18/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/18/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/19/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/26/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/26/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/26/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/26/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/26/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/26/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/26/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/08/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/15/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/22/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/12/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/27/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/27/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/27/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/27/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/27/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/27/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/27/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/27/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/12/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 08/01/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 08/01/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 08/01/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/03/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/04/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/06/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/17/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/17/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/17/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/17/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/19/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/19/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/20/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/20/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/20/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/01/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/01/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/01/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/02/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/02/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/02/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/02/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/02/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/02/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/02/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/03/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/29/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/29/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/29/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/29/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/29/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/30/2007