Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/09/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/09/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/19/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/19/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/19/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/21/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/22/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/23/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/18/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/12/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/14/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/26/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/11/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/16/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/27/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/30/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/06/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/14/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/14/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/24/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/01/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/15/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/29/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 03/04/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/04/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/04/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/04/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/06/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/11/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/31/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/17/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/22/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/17/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/19/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/24/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/24/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/25/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/08/2008