Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/27/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/17/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/19/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/19/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/26/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/02/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/02/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/05/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/15/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew