Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/09/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/09/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/09/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 03/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/29/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/29/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/29/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/29/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/29/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/29/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/29/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/29/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/29/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/29/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/29/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/29/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/29/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/29/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/29/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/29/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/17/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/17/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/17/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/20/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/20/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/20/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/20/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/20/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/20/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/01/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/08/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/08/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/14/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/14/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/14/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/14/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/07/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/27/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/27/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/12/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/19/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/07/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/07/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/24/2008