Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/27/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/27/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/28/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/01/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/05/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/07/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/09/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/12/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/13/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/21/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/22/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/22/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/23/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/01/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/01/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/07/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/08/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/22/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/23/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/05/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/06/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/12/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/18/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/19/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/10/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/26/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/06/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/02/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/03/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/09/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/22/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/23/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/29/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/01/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/06/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/12/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/28/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/04/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/06/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/10/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/11/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/14/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/14/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/14/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/01/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2008