Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/28/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/28/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/28/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/28/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/28/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/28/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/28/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/28/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/28/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/28/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/28/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/28/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/28/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/05/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/05/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/05/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/05/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/05/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/05/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/05/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/07/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/07/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/07/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/07/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/07/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/07/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/08/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/08/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/08/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/08/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/09/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/09/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/13/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/13/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/13/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/13/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/13/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/13/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/14/2007