Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/28/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/28/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/09/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/09/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/09/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/26/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/25/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/25/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/25/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/09/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/11/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/10/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 12/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/06/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/26/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/17/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/29/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/10/2008