Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/20/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/20/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/20/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/20/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/20/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/20/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/20/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/20/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/20/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/20/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/20/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/20/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/20/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/20/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/20/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/20/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/20/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/03/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/03/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/03/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/17/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/17/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/17/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/22/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/24/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/24/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/11/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/11/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/11/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/11/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/11/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/11/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/15/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/15/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/15/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/15/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/15/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/15/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/15/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/15/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/15/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/15/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/22/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/22/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/22/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/22/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/22/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/22/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/22/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/22/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/22/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/22/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/22/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/22/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/22/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/22/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/22/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/22/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/22/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/22/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/22/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 06/22/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/28/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/12/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/12/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/12/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/12/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/19/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/26/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/26/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/26/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/26/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/26/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/10/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/10/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/10/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/17/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/17/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/20/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/20/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/20/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/20/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/26/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/23/2008