Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/13/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/09/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/09/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/09/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/15/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/23/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/23/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/23/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/24/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/24/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/09/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/23/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/16/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/16/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 08/02/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/17/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/17/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/17/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/18/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/18/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/26/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/26/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/01/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/01/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/01/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 12/04/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/04/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/17/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/17/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/17/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/17/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/23/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/29/2008