Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 01/26/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/30/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/30/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/30/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 01/30/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 01/30/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 01/30/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 01/30/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 01/30/2006
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 01/30/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/30/2006
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 01/30/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/31/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/31/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 01/31/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/01/2006
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/01/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/01/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/01/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/02/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/02/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 02/02/2006