Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/25/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 05/25/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/06/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/06/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/07/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/07/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/07/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/07/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/07/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/08/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/08/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/08/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/08/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/08/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/08/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/09/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/09/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/09/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/13/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/13/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/14/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/14/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/14/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/14/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 06/14/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/15/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/15/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/28/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/28/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/26/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 11/08/2005