Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/26/2006
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/26/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/26/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/05/2006
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 06/12/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/19/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/11/2006