Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/10/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/10/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/10/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/10/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 05/10/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/10/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/10/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/16/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/16/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/16/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/16/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/16/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/16/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/16/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/16/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 05/16/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/16/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/16/2005
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 05/16/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/16/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/16/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/16/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/16/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/16/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/16/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/17/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/17/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/17/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/17/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 05/18/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/18/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/18/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/18/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/18/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/19/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/19/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/23/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 05/23/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/26/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/06/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/06/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/13/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/15/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/28/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/28/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/19/2005