Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 07/22/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/21/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/18/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/18/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 10/19/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 10/24/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 10/27/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/31/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/09/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 03/09/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/04/2006
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/06/2006