Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/08/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/08/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/08/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/08/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/08/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/14/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/14/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/14/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/16/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/16/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/16/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/21/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 07/29/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/30/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 10/25/2005