Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/14/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/10/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/19/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/26/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/26/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/26/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/26/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/26/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 05/26/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/26/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/07/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/13/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/20/2005
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/21/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/21/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 06/23/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/24/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/12/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/12/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/13/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/13/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/13/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/14/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/14/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/18/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/19/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/19/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/19/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 07/19/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/20/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/20/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/25/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/25/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/26/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/26/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/26/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/26/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 07/26/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/27/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/28/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/28/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/29/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/29/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/29/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/29/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/29/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/29/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/29/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/29/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/29/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/29/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/29/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/29/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/29/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/29/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/29/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/29/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/29/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/06/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 09/06/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/06/2005
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/13/2005
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/13/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/04/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/04/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/24/2005