Refine your search

Date Major Actions
11/27/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-374.
11/27/2006 Signed by President.
11/21/2006 Presented to President.
11/13/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8590-8591)
09/30/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 9/29/2006 S10794-10795)
09/30/2006 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/08/2006 Introduced in Senate