Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 01/31/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 01/31/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/31/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/31/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 02/01/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/01/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/03/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/03/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/03/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/03/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 02/03/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/03/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/10/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/10/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/10/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 02/10/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/10/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 02/14/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/14/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/14/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/16/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/16/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 02/17/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/02/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/07/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/08/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/04/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/04/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/04/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/11/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/11/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/11/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/11/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/11/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/13/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/13/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/13/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/13/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/13/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/13/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/13/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/13/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/13/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/14/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/16/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/21/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/21/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/21/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/21/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/22/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/22/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/22/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/28/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 06/29/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/29/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/29/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/30/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/11/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/11/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/11/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/13/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/14/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/14/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/18/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 07/20/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/29/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/08/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/27/2005