Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 05/17/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 05/17/2006
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/17/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/17/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 05/17/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/18/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/25/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/06/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/26/2006
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/28/2006