Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/03/2006
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/03/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/03/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/03/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/03/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/03/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/03/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/03/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/09/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/09/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/09/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/11/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/15/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/15/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 05/15/2006
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/15/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/16/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/16/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 05/18/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/19/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/22/2006
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 05/24/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/25/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/06/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/06/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/07/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/07/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/09/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/13/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/14/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/14/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/14/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/20/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/21/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/26/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/26/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/26/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/27/2006