Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/18/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/18/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 01/18/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/18/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/18/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/25/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 01/25/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/25/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 01/25/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/25/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 01/31/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/01/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/02/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/07/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/08/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/08/2006
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 02/14/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/16/2006
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/16/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/27/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/28/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/02/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/02/2006
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/02/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 03/06/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/06/2006
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/07/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/14/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 03/15/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/16/2006
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/28/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/29/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/02/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/04/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/16/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/05/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/11/2006