Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 10/21/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 10/21/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/21/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 10/21/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 10/21/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 10/21/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 10/21/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 01/25/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/09/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/05/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/17/2006