Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/18/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 10/18/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 12/12/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/12/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 12/13/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/13/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 12/15/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/19/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/19/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/19/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/02/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 02/13/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/14/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/28/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/14/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/14/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/07/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/07/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/07/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/07/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/07/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/07/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/07/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/07/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/07/2006
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/07/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/07/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/07/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/07/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/07/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/07/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 04/07/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/07/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/07/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/07/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/07/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/07/2006
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/07/2006
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/07/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/07/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/07/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/07/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/07/2006
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/07/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/07/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/07/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/07/2006
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/07/2006
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/07/2006
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/07/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/07/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/07/2006
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 04/07/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/07/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/07/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/07/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/07/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/07/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/07/2006
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/07/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/07/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/07/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/07/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 04/07/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 04/07/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/07/2006
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/24/2006