Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (11/17/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Wartime Treatment Study Act - Title I: Commission On Wartime Treatment Of European Americans - (Sec. 101) Establishes a seven member Commission on Wartime Treatment of European Americans. Requires the Commission to include two members representing the interests of Italian Americans and two members representing the interests of German Americans.

(Sec. 102) Directs the Commission to review U.S. government wartime treatment (from September 1, 1939, through December 31, 1948) of European Americans and European Latin Americans and include in such review: (1) civil liberties violations resulting from enforcement of the Alien Enemies Acts, Presidential Proclamations 2526, 2527, 2655, 2662, Executive Orders 9066 and 9095, and related directives pertaining to the registration, arrest, exclusion, internment, exchange, or deportation of European Americans and European Latin Americans; (2) U.S. government actions against European Americans under the Alien Enemies Acts and Executive Order 9066, including registration requirements, travel and property restrictions, internment, and forced abandonment of property; (3) participation by European Americans in the U.S. Armed Forces; and (4) appropriate remedies, including future protection of civil liberties during wartime.

Requires the Commission to: (1) hold public hearings; and (2) submit a written report to Congress on its findings and recommendations. Terminates the Commission 60 days after it submits its report. Authorizes appropriations.

Title II: Commission On Wartime Treatment Of Jewish Refugees - (Sec. 201) Establishes a seven member Commission on Wartime Treatment of Jewish Refugees. Requires the Commission to include two members representing the interests of Jewish refugees.

(Sec. 202) Directs the Commission to review the U.S. government's refusal to allow entry into the United States of Jewish and other refugees fleeing persecution in Europe between January 1, 1933, and December 31, 1945, including: (1) the underlying rationale for such refusal; (2) the perceived benefits of such refusal; (3) the impact of such refusal on the refugees; and (4) federal refugee policy, including recommendations for improving access of future victims of persecution or genocide to refuge in the United States.

Requires the Commission to: (1) hold hearings; and (2) submit a written report to Congress on its findings and recommendations. Terminates the Commission 60 days after it submits its report to Congress. Authorizes appropriations.