Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 06/21/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/21/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 06/21/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 06/21/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/21/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 06/21/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/21/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 06/21/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/21/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/31/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/09/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/13/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/19/2006