Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 07/19/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 01/25/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/02/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 03/06/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/14/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/28/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/03/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/16/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/27/2006