Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/15/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/03/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 03/03/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/03/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/03/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/09/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/09/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/09/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/09/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/09/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/09/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/19/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/19/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/30/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/14/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/25/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/28/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/28/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 10/07/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/17/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/25/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/25/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/06/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/19/2006