Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/28/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/06/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/20/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/29/2006