Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/07/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 09/08/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/13/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/19/2006