Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/13/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/17/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/17/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/17/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/17/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/17/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/17/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/17/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/17/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/17/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/17/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/17/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/17/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/17/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/17/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/17/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/17/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/17/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/17/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/18/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/18/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/18/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/18/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/18/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/18/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/18/2006
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/18/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/18/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/18/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/18/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 07/18/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/18/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/19/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/19/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/19/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/20/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/24/2006
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/24/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/06/2006