Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/01/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/01/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/01/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/01/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/03/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/03/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/03/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/03/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/03/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/03/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/07/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/07/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/07/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/07/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/07/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/07/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/08/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/08/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/08/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/09/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/10/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/14/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/16/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/16/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/03/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/17/2005