Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 06/09/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/09/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/13/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/13/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/13/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/13/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/13/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/13/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/13/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/13/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/15/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/15/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/16/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/20/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/22/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/22/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/22/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/26/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/10/2006