Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/06/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/09/2006
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/09/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/09/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/09/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/15/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/15/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/15/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/15/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/15/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/15/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/15/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/19/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/19/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/22/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/22/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 06/22/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/22/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/22/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/22/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/28/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/28/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/28/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/20/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/06/2006