Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/02/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/02/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/02/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/02/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/02/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/02/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/02/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/02/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/02/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/02/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/02/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/02/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/02/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/02/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/02/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/11/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/11/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/11/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/17/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/18/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/18/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/25/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/25/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/25/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/25/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/12/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/12/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/12/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/26/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/28/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/27/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/12/2006