Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/16/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/16/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/06/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/19/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/19/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/19/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/22/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/22/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/28/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/28/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/28/2006