Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/09/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 03/09/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/04/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/04/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/04/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/27/2006